Welcome to the
Speed Multiply Trick
For Two Digit Numbers    Somewhere hidden behind this page and locked with a secret password is a treasure page bursting with FREE treasure.

To find it, all you need to do is learn how to SPEED MULTIPLY. Then solve the password clue problems. THE SPEED MULTIPLY TRICK:
Works best with two digit numbers.
*The following text is taken as an example from the book . We at themathlab.com highly recommend this book if you really want to become a mental math whiz.

"To multiply two 2-digit numbers without showing work, first multiply the ones digits together, then 'cross-multiply,' and finally multiply the tens digits together.

Make sure to carry whenever a product exceeds 9. As you will see in the examples below, you must work your way from right to left to perform this trick.

EX 1:
12 x 23 = ?

1. Multiply the ones digits: 2x3=6 (ones digit answer).
3. Multiply the tens digits: 1x2=2 (hundreds-digit answer).

Thought Process Summary EX 2:
31 x 24 = ?

1. Multiply the ones digits: 1x4=4 (ones digits answer).
2. Cross-multiply and add: (3x4)+(1x2)=14 (use the 4 as the tens-digit answer, and carry the 1).
3. Multiply the tens digits, and add the 1: (3x2)+1=7 (hundreds-digit answer).

Thought Process Summary *Number-Power Note: This trick will also work on numbers with zeroes and decimal points.

Also as you are cross-multiplying, it is generally easier to begin with the larger product and then add the smaller product." Password Clues Use the SPEED MULTIPLY TRICK to do the following problems in order. When you find each answer, look in the left column to find its corresponding letter and write this letter. x13 x21 ----- x22 x14 ----- x32 x15 ----- x42 x42 ----- x51 x33 ----- x25 x13 ----- x44 x11 ----- x53 x34 ----- x14 x52 ----- 43 x45 ----- .35 x 41 ------ .23 x 55 ----- .54 x 15 ----- .21 x 51 ----- .34 x 34 ----- .12 x 45 ----- Now cross of every o,b,r,and t. You will be left with the password. 480 = u 1,802 = k 273 = o 1,071 = o 325 = r 810 = l 728 = a 308 = f 540 = c 484 = t 1,764 = b 1,435 = b 1,156 = i 1,265 = e 1,935 = d 1,683 = n  